Department
Fax No
N/A
MIS Email
ahmed.ahmed194@law.au.edu.eg
Mobile
N/A
Office
N/A - 064426
Google Scholar
Ph. D. In Commercial Law () , Faculty of Law Assiut University , 1991
Other In () , , 1983
Other In () , , 1982
LIC. In Commercial Law () , Faculty of Law Assiut University , 1981
Other In () , , 1983
Other In () , , 1982
LIC. In Commercial Law () , Faculty of Law Assiut University , 1981
Professor Faculty of Law, Assiut University , 2011
Associate Professor Faculty of Law, ِِAssiut University , 2001
Lecturer Faculty of Law, ِِAssiut University , 1991
Assistant Lecturer Faculty of Law, ِِAssiut University , 1983
Demonstrator Faculty of Law, ِِAssiut University , 1981
Faculty of Law, Assiut University ,since 2006-09-02 To 2013-10-31
Vice Dean for Graduate Studies and Research Faculty of Law, Assiut University ,since 2012-10-31 To 2018-10-31
Head Faculty of Law, Assiut University ,since 2008-03-01 To 2011-09-27
Vice Dean for Community Services and Environmental Development Faculty of Law, Assiut University ,since 2012-08-14 To 2012-10-30
Head Faculty of Law, Assiut University ,since 2011-09-28 To 2012-08-14
1- Hzar mahmoud Mohamed Elatify , ,2014-07-17
supervisor:
2- Mohamed Ali awad , ,2011-07-24
supervisor:
3- Mahmoud Saaleh Kayed , ,2010-11-28
supervisor:
4- Abd Elrahman hemead nagy , ,2010-10-31
supervisor:
5- Mohamed Hussien Saleh , ,2010-06-27
supervisor:
6- Abd elsalam kasem Ali , ,2009-11-22
supervisor:
7- Fwaz Mohamed Ahmed Saed , ,2011-07-24
supervisor: أ.د/ احمد بركات مصطفى و أ.د/ حماد مصطفى عزب
8- Mohamed abdella , ,2011-06-26
supervisor:
9- Mohamed Mohamed Ebeed Mobark , ,2011-05-29
supervisor:
10- Shafik Anwar Fadl Ali , ,2013-06-30
supervisor: Hammad Mostafa Azab, Ahmad Barakat Mostafa
11- Aboud Abd Allah Mosad Aly , ,2013-06-30
supervisor: Hammad Mostafa Azab, Ahmad Barakat Mostafa
12- El-Houssain Mohamed Youseif Hossain , ,2012-06-30
supervisor: Ahmad Barakat Mostafa, Nasser Osman Mohamed
supervisor:
2- Mohamed Ali awad , ,2011-07-24
supervisor:
3- Mahmoud Saaleh Kayed , ,2010-11-28
supervisor:
4- Abd Elrahman hemead nagy , ,2010-10-31
supervisor:
5- Mohamed Hussien Saleh , ,2010-06-27
supervisor:
6- Abd elsalam kasem Ali , ,2009-11-22
supervisor:
7- Fwaz Mohamed Ahmed Saed , ,2011-07-24
supervisor: أ.د/ احمد بركات مصطفى و أ.د/ حماد مصطفى عزب
8- Mohamed abdella , ,2011-06-26
supervisor:
9- Mohamed Mohamed Ebeed Mobark , ,2011-05-29
supervisor:
10- Shafik Anwar Fadl Ali , ,2013-06-30
supervisor: Hammad Mostafa Azab, Ahmad Barakat Mostafa
11- Aboud Abd Allah Mosad Aly , ,2013-06-30
supervisor: Hammad Mostafa Azab, Ahmad Barakat Mostafa
12- El-Houssain Mohamed Youseif Hossain , ,2012-06-30
supervisor: Ahmad Barakat Mostafa, Nasser Osman Mohamed